RI H5543 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits unauthorized access to confidential information from a computer, computer program, computer system, or computer network.
Title
Computer Crime
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017) |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5543.pdf |