RI H5541 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes a fee of one hundred sixty dollars ($160) for all domestic and foreign corporations for a certificate of authority to transact business in this state.
Title
Rhode Island Business Corporation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2021) |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5541.pdf |