RI H5541 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies that the jurisdiction for violations of ยง11-9-1.5 ("electronically disseminating indecent material to minors prohibited") is vested in the superior court.
Title
Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-03-15 | House | House read and passed |
2017-03-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-03-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/07/2017) |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017) |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |