RI H5540 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restores the amount of education aid given to the towns of Middletown and Portsmouth to those amounts and levels in effect for the fiscal year prior to the implementation of the permanent foundation education aid formula.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5540.pdf |