RI H5537 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Enables Rhode Island licensed new motor vehicle dealers to conduct vehicle identification number inspections and submits them for an NCIC check by the chiefs of police or designees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certificates Of Title And Security Interests

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-20HouseSigned by Governor
2023-06-15HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-15SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2023-06-15SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-14HouseHouse passed Sub A
2023-06-12HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/14/2023)
2023-06-12HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2023-06-09HouseProposed Substitute
2023-06-09HouseScheduled for consideration (06/12/2023)
2023-03-17HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-14HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2023)
2023-03-14HouseMeeting postponed (03/14/2023)
2023-03-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-02-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback