RI H5537 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/19/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/19/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts fire districts from the provisions of the budget commission chapter.
Title
Budget Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/19/2015) |
2015-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5537.pdf |