RI H5536 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that law enforcement personnel, emergency medical personnel, and agencies participating in the HOPE initiative be exempt from civil liability or criminal prosecution as a result of administering opioid antagonists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Good Samaritan Overdose Prevention Act Of 2016

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseSigned by Governor
2019-07-11HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-26SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-18SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-14SenateScheduled for consideration (06/18/2019)
2019-06-13SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019)
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2019-05-15HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-05-10HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/15/2019)
2019-05-08HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-05-06HouseProposed Substitute
2019-05-03HouseScheduled for consideration (05/08/2019)
2019-05-01HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-26HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019)
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback