RI H5535 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the public utilities commission to review and approve the electric distribution company's use of real estate and other capital assets and expenditures.
Title
Revenue Decoupling
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017) |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5535.pdf |