RI H5534 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Providence to issue not more than $140,000,000 bonds to finance the construction, renovation, improvement, alteration, repair, landscaping, furnishing and equipping of schools and school facilities throughout the city of Providence.
Title
Authorizing The City Of Providence To Issue Not To Exceed $140,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Landscaping, Furnishing And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities Throughout The City, Subject To Approval Of State Housing Aid At A Reimbursement Rate Or State Share Ratio Of Not Less Than 75% At The Time Of Issuance And Provided That The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By The Amount Of Certain Grants Received From State Bond Proceeds, From The Rhode Island Department Of Education Or From The Rhode Island School Building Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] |
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee on Finance: Passage (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee on Finance: Passage (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-04-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/13/2021) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2021) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2021-03-16 | House | House read and passed |
2021-03-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/16/2021) |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-03-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/11/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2021) |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |