RI H5533 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the application fee for pharmacists to two hundred dollars ($200) annually.
Title
Relating To Businesses And Professions
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Barbara Ann Fenton-Fung [R] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2021) |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5533.pdf |