RI H5529 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes operators of developmental disability agencies, acting as a group, to self-insure health care costs for employees, retirees and other beneficiaries and allows a third-party administrator to administer said program.
Title
Self-insurance Of Developmental Disability Agencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-10-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-30 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2017) |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |