RI H5525 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that any manufacturer or installer of solar module systems in Rhode Island establish a program as set up by the department of environmental management, for the safe disposal of those systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Photovoltaic Takeback Act Of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2021)
2021-02-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback