RI H5522 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits tenants of multi-unit residences to terminate their lease agreements if no action is taken to remedy the presence of secondhand smoke.
Title
Multi-unit Residence Safety Act
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2017) |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5522.pdf |