RI H5517 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides penalties for the possession, manufacture, sale or delivery of more than one ounce mixture or substance containing a detectable amount of fentanyl.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Controlled Substances Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-30HouseSigned by Governor
2017-06-28HouseTransmitted to Governor
2017-06-27SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2017-06-22SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2017)
2017-06-13SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2017-06-09SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2017)
2017-05-30SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2017-03-30HouseHouse passed Sub A
2017-03-24HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/30/2017)
2017-03-07HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-03-03HouseScheduled for consideration (03/07/2017)
2017-02-28HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-02-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017)
2017-02-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback