RI H5514 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public utilities to provide prompt and adequate service for new service/ service upgrades subject to $10,000 per violation and provide written estimate for work costing more than $500/ itemized bill for work performed payable by ratepayer.
Title
Duties Of Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2021) |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5514.pdf |