RI H5514 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - State Police (would Provide That Certain Public Safety Officers Be Granted Retirement Benefits Equal To Those Given To The State Police)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - State Police (would Provide That Certain Public Safety Officers Be Granted Retirement Benefits Equal To Those Given To The State Police)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2013) |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5514.pdf |