RI H5513 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Innovation, Internet, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Innovation, Internet, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all persons or entities collecting social security and other personal identification numbers to create and publicly display a privacy protection policy. Violations of this requirement would incur a civil penalty of five-hundred dollars ($500).
Title
General Regulatory Provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2021) |
2021-02-28 | House | Committee transferred to House Innovation, Internet, & Technology |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5513.pdf |