RI H5512 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the judicial nominating commission be composed of at least three (3) members of color.
Title
Judicial Nominating Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5512.pdf |