RI H5505 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-18 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Makes changes in the definitions of what constitutes unlawful confinement, and would apply them throughout the chapter accordingly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal Care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2015-06-17HouseHouse passed Sub A
2015-06-13HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/17/2015)
2015-06-11HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2015-06-05HouseScheduled for reconsideration (06/11/2015)
2015-06-04HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2015-06-02HouseScheduled for consideration (06/04/2015)
2015-04-02HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2015-03-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2015)
2015-03-18HouseCommittee transferred to House Environment and Natural Resources
2015-02-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback