RI H5504 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the sale of alcoholic beverages on New Year's Day by retail Class A licensees.
Title
Regulation Of Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-05-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/11/2021) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/05/2021) |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2021-04-28 | House | House read and passed |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/28/2021) |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2021) |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2021) |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |