RI H5503 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the attorney general's office respond to complaints prohibiting public access public records within twenty (20) days and would proceed as necessary within that timeframe.
Title
Access To Public Records
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Justin Price [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5503.pdf |