RI H5502 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Legislative Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations To Protect Our Environment And Natural Resources From Plastic Bottle Waste (creates A 16 Member Joint Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations To Protect Our Environment From Plastic Bottle Waste, And Who Would Report Back To The General Assembly By February 28, 2024, And Expire On June 30, 2024.)
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Legislative Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations To Protect Our Environment And Natural Resources From Plastic Bottle Waste (creates A 16 Member Joint Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations To Protect Our Environment From Plastic Bottle Waste, And Who Would Report Back To The General Assembly By February 28, 2024, And Expire On June 30, 2024.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-23 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-06-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-14 | House | House passed Sub A |
2023-06-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2023) |
2023-06-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2023-06-11 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2023-06-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2023) |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2023) |
2023-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |