RI H5499 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the expungement of criminal records for any crime that has, subsequent to the conviction or plea of nolo contendere, has been repealed.
Title
Relating To Criminal Procedure-identification And Apprehension Of Criminals
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5499.pdf |