RI H5497 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires carriers offering dental benefit plans to annually submit information which includes the current and projected medical loss ratio for claims for their plans. The medical loss ratio would be eighty-five percent (85%).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonprofit Dental Service Corporations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-03HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2023)
2023-02-10HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback