RI H5493 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows volunteer firefighters who pay for their own training and equipment to receive an income tax credit if those expenses are not reimbursed by their employer.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Rep. David Place [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5493.pdf |