RI H5485 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-29 - Meeting postponed (06/30/2021)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-29 - Meeting postponed (06/30/2021)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows school committees to add item(s) to their agendas for the purposes of discussion only without having to publish notice of the additional item(s).
Title
Open Meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-06-10 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2021) |
2021-05-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-21 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2021) |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |