RI H5478 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that an open and obvious danger or defect is not a complete bar to recovery of damages in personal injury or property damage actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procedure Generally

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseSigned by Governor
2019-07-11HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-27SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-20SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-18SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2019)
2019-06-18SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2019-06-13HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-06-10HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/13/2019)
2019-06-04HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-05-31HouseScheduled for consideration (06/04/2019)
2019-05-31HouseProposed Substitute
2019-03-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019)
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback