RI H5477 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Cumberland to issue general obligation bonds and notes not to exceed $2,500,000 for the development/improvement/repair/alteration/construction/renovation/equipping of recreational areas and facilities in the town.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The Town Of Cumberland To Issue General Obligation Bonds And/or Notes In An Amount Not To Exceed $2,500,000 To Finance The Development, Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair And Equipping Of Recreational Areas And Facilities In The Town

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2021-04-15HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-04-13SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/13/2021)
2021-04-05SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2021-04-02SenateScheduled for consideration (04/05/2021)
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Senate Finance
2021-03-09HouseHouse read and passed
2021-03-05HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/09/2021)
2021-03-04HouseCommittee recommends passage
2021-02-26HouseScheduled for consideration (03/04/2021)
2021-02-25HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-02-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2021)
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback