RI H5474 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants public safety officials/other named employees/essential state workers with COVID-19 job-related presumption related to workers' compensation benefits and other benefits/privileges.
Title
Workers' Compensation--occupational Diseases
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2021) |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5474.pdf |