RI H5466 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires administrator of Rhode Island veterans' home to possess a nursing home administrator license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Veterans' Home

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-12 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-14SenateSigned by Governor
2023-06-12SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-12HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2023-06-09HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/12/2023)
2023-06-08SenateSenate passed Sub A
2023-06-07SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023)
2023-06-06SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2023-06-05SenateProposed Substitute
2023-06-02SenateScheduled for consideration (06/06/2023)
2023-06-02SenateReferred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
2023-05-25HouseHouse read and passed
2023-05-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/25/2023)
2023-05-11HouseCommittee recommends passage
2023-05-05HouseScheduled for consideration (05/11/2023)
2023-03-16HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-14HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2023)
2023-03-14HouseMeeting postponed (03/14/2023)
2023-03-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-02-08HouseIntroduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback