RI H5464 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates a patient shall not be denied appropriate care on the basis of age/sex/gender identity/sexual orientation, race/color/marital status/familial status/disability/religion/national origin/source of income/source of payment or profession.
Title
Licensing Of Health Care Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2021) |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5464.pdf |