RI H5458 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the sunset provision which ends historic preservation tax credits by June 30, 2021 or upon the exhaustion of the maximum aggregate credits, whichever comes first.
Title
Historic Preservation Tax Credits 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2021) |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5458.pdf |