RI H5457 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a free course of instruction for the parent, guardian, or designee of a child enrolled in a driver education program.
Title
Operators' And Chauffeurs' Licenses
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Chauffeurs' licenses approval of amendment in concurrence (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2017) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2017) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2017-05-17 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/17/2017) |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/03/2017) |
2017-04-11 | House | House voted to recommit to House H.E.W. |
2017-03-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/11/2017) |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/29/2017) |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2017) |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |