RI H5454 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Designating June 27 To Be Post - Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day In Rhode Island And The Month Of June To Be Post - Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month In Rhode Island
Title
House Resolution Designating June 27 To Be Post - Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day In Rhode Island And The Month Of June To Be Post - Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month In Rhode Island
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2017) |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/10/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2017) |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |