RI H5446 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts post-use polymers and recovered feedstocks used in advanced recycling processes from the definition of solid waste.
Title
Refuse Disposal--elimination Of Post-use Polymers And Recovered Feedstocks Used In Advanced Recycling Processes From Solid Waste
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2021) |
2021-03-05 | House | Committee transferred to House Corporations |
2021-03-01 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/04/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5446.pdf |