RI H5445 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a statewide greenhouse gas emission reduction mandate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2021 Act On Climate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 5 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 10 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 10 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 8 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 10 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - Passage (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 11 N: 54 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 13 N: 55 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 13 N: 53 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - Passage (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 13 N: 56 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 10 N: 58 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 16 N: 50 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 13 N: 58 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 13 N: 57 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 15 N: 54 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - House - House Committee on Environment and Natural Resources: Passage of Sub A (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-10HouseSigned by Governor
2021-04-06HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-04-06SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/06/2021)
2021-03-31SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2021-03-26SenateScheduled for consideration (03/31/2021)
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
2021-03-23HouseHouse passed Sub A
2021-03-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/23/2021)
2021-03-18HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2021-03-17HouseProposed Substitute
2021-03-12HouseScheduled for consideration (03/18/2021)
2021-02-26HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-02-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2021)
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Rhode Island State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://status.rilegislature.gov/
Texthttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5445.pdf
Texthttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5445A.pdf
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=17330
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=17331
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=17332
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=17333
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=17334
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=17335
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=17336
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=17337
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=17338
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=17339
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=17340
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=17342
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=17343
Roll Callhttps://status.rilegislature.gov/committee_vote_detail.aspx?id=25045
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12877
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12878
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12879
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12880
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12881
Roll Callhttps://webserver.rilegislature.gov/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12882

Bill Comments

feedback