RI H5443 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an exception to required school immunizations for pupils whose personal, philosophical, or religious beliefs are contrary to immunization and/or testing.
Title
Offenses Pertaining To Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2021) |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5443.pdf |