RI H5442 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that any reports of investigations conducted by internal affair units or their equivalent are public records.
Title
Access To Public Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2023) |
2023-03-25 | House | Committee transferred to House State Government & Elections |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5442.pdf |