RI H5438 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the contractual provisions contained in an otherwise expired collective bargaining agreement with all full and adjunct professors at state universities and colleges would continue until a successor agreement has been reached.
Title
Council On Postsecondary Education [see Title 16 Chapter 97 -- The Rhode Island Board Of Education Act]
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Rep. Christopher Millea [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5438.pdf |