RI H5436 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts natural hair braiders from the requirement to be licensed as hairdressers or cosmeticians, and defines the practice of natural hair braiding.
Title
Barbers, Hairdressers, Cosmeticians, Manicurists And Estheticians
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2017-05-23 | House | House read and passed |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/23/2017) |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2017) |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2017) |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/07/2017) |
2017-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |