RI H5434 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-25 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Excludes chronic intractable pain from the definition of "acute pain management", for purposes of prescribing, administering and dispensing controlled substances by a practitioner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Controlled Substances Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2019-06-21SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2019)
2019-06-21SenateReferred to Senate Health and Human Services
2019-06-19HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-06-14HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2019)
2019-06-12HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-07HouseProposed Substitute
2019-06-07HouseScheduled for consideration (06/12/2019)
2019-03-20HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-15HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2019)
2019-03-04HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (03/06/2019)
2019-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback