RI H5433 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain state and municipal agents to take possession of animals found abandoned or neglected, and to proceed to provide all necessary care and treatment for the animal.
Title
Seizure Of Animals Being Cruelly Treated
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Passage (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Passage (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-06-06 | House | House read and passed |
2019-05-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-29 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/03/2019) |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |