RI H5431 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Includes any "licensed public health dental hygienist" among persons eligible to conduct dental screenings for children in kindergarten, third, and ninth grade.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Rep. Mario Mendez [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-19 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2019) |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |