RI H5428 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows nursing facilities to suspend payment of gross patient revenue assessments until such time as the department of health human services provides any reimbursement owed to the nursing facilities.
Title
Nursing Facility Provider Assessment
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5428.pdf |