RI H5427 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Healthy Beverage Act" which would require that children's meals offered by restaurants include certain healthy beverage options if the beverage is automatically included in the meal.
Title
Healthy Beverage Act
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Rep. Mario Mendez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5427.pdf |