RI H5423 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an income tax credit of twenty-five percent (25%) of an elderly resident taxpayers primary residence water and sewer bills, not to exceed $250.
Title
Personal Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
Rep. Helder Cunha [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-05-30 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2017) |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5423.pdf |