RI H5411 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds climate change/sea-level rise/coastal resiliency to data analysis. Changes number of members of the economic development planning council from 17 to 19 by adding the directors of environmental management and coastal resources council.
Title
Long-term Economic Development
Sponsors
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Michelle McGaw [D] |
Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/22/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Small Business |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5411.pdf |