RI H5403 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires an individual employer to meet certain criteria in order to qualify for class exemption from the increased pay requirement for work on holidays and Sundays.
Title
Work On Holidays And Sundays
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5403.pdf |