RI H5399 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/03/2023)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes and requires the department of human services to hire an administrator for the refugee assistance program on a full-time basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department Of Human Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (05/03/2023)
2023-04-28HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-02-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback