RI H5396 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for an appropriation by the general assembly in the amount of two million dollars ($2,000,000) to the various school districts and municipalities to employ additional social workers.
Title
The Educational Equity And Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2023) |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5396.pdf |